KY HB47 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 224.40-120 to allow an off-site construction or demolition waste disposal permittee to request an increase in the size of the permitted area to no more than 2 acres total if the applicant is compliant with the permit requirements for the currently permitted area and complies with all permit requirements for the newly permitted area, including posting an additional bond for the newly permitted area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to construction or demolition waste disposal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 58 (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2021-02-10Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-10House3rd reading, passed 73-16
2021-02-09Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021
2021-02-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-02Houseposted in committee
2021-01-13Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-09-16HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback