KY HB461 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 271B.8-300 to insert gender-neutral language.
Title
AN ACT relating to directors of corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-09 | House | reassigned to Education (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb461.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb461/orig_bill.pdf |