KY HB46 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 082)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.195 to require each public elementary and secondary school to display the national motto in a prominent location in the school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the display of the national motto in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1014 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 166 (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 165 (Y: 40 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 082)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 29-8
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-03-07Senateto Education (S)
2019-02-28Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-27Housepassed 72-25
2019-02-27Housefloor amendment (1) defeated
2019-02-27House3rd reading
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-08-16HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback