KY HB456 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - to Education (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - to Education (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.345 to require the council or, if no council exists, the principal in each school containing any grades five through 12, to adopt a policy to administer a drug abuse prevention program, that includes opioid abuse prevention; require the program to be designed to ensure delivery to students, at a minimum once during grades five through eight and once during grades nine through 12; and amend KRS 158.442 to require the Center for School Safety to provide program development and implementation expertise and technical support to schools for drug abuse prevention programming.
Title
AN ACT relating to drug education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-2 |
2016-03-03 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-23 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-02-22 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB456.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB456/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB456/vote_history.pdf |