KY HB453 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amends KRS 620.040 to require that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services determine the military status of any parent or guardian subject to an investigation and notify a Department of Defense family advocacy program of an investigation involving a member of the United States Armed Forces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to assistance for military families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3142 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 133 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-09Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 133)
2024-03-28Housedelivered to Governor
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2024-03-28Housereceived in House
2024-03-28Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2024-03-27Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-26Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-25Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-21Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-15Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-11Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2024-03-08Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024
2024-03-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2024-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2024-03-06Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2024-02-23Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2024-02-23Senatereceived in Senate
2024-02-22House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with committee amendment (1-title)
2024-02-15Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 16, 2024
2024-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2024-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Amendment (1-title)
2024-02-09Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
2024-02-01Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2024-02-01Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback