KY HB453 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor Acts ch. 51)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor Acts ch. 51)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections of KRS 186.400 to 186.640, and KRS Chapters 189A and 281A to make the Transportation Cabinet the sole application and issuance entity for operator's licenses and personal identification cards and eliminate the requirements that these documents be applied for in the county of residence; amend KRS 186.419 to expand the list of documents an applicant can use when applying for a voluntary travel ID; amend KRS 186.490 to allow circuit clerk offices to continue issuing standard identity credentials until the Transportation Cabinet determines that a cabinet regional office can assume those duties; require all circuit clerks' offices to stop issuing operator's licenses and personal ID cards by June 30, 2022; amend KRS 186.531 to set forth a distribution schedule for license and ID card fees for these documents that are applied for with the Transportation Cabinet; amend KRS 186.010 to define the phrase "alternative technology"; amend KRS 116.0452, 116.0455, and 116.085 to conform; EMERGENCY
Title
AN ACT relating to identity documents, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1394 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 181 (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 181 (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | signed by Governor Acts ch. 51) |
2020-03-19 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 21-10 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-17 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-14 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-21 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Budget and Financial Administration
Circuit Clerks
Driver Licensing
Effective Dates, Emergency
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
State Agencies
Transportation
Circuit Clerks
Driver Licensing
Effective Dates, Emergency
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
State Agencies
Transportation