KY HB45 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.1-010 to redefine "disposal," "municipal solid waste disposal facility," "waste site or facility," "waste," and "solid waste management facility"; define "advanced recycling," "advanced recycling facility," "depolymerization," "gasification," "post-use polymer," "pyrolysis," "recovered feedstock," and "solvolysis"; amend KRS 109.012 to redefine "solid waste," "solid waste management," and "solid waste management facility."
Title
AN ACT relating to resource recovery.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 402 (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2140 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2140 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 67) |
2022-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | passed 88-3 |
2022-03-25 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | received in House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-13 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 31, 2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-19 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-08-05 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |