KY HB439 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 241.010 to make a technical correction; amend KRS 241.060 and 243.540 to allow the Alcoholic Beverage Control board to dispose of alcoholic beverages through public auction; promulgate administrative regulations to establish auction procedures; donate all auction proceeds to the alcohol wellness and responsibility education fund; amend KRS 243.030 to create a $300 annual vintage distilled spirits license fee; amend KRS 243.110 to authorize the holder of a primary license to also hold a vintage distilled spirits license; amend KRS 243.232 to restructure vintage distilled spirits licenses and sales; allow a licensee who may sell distilled spirits by the drink or package to receive a vintage distilled spirits license as a supplementary license; require vintage distilled spirits licensees to file a monthly report with the department giving details about sellers and purchase types, dates, and quantities; require all purchases to be in-person at the licensed premises; direct the licensee to conspicuously label the purchase as vintage distilled spirits; limit a licensee to 24 vintage distilled spirits packages purchased from each seller every 12 months; limit the seller to 24 packages total every 12 months; amend KRS 243.360 to give an applicant the option to advertise intent to apply for a license on the department's website or in another manner to be determined by the department and to exempt a vintage distilled spirits license applicant from the public notice advertising requirement; amend KRS 243.990 to establish penalties for vintage distilled spirits sellers who exceed the maximum package limit; amend KRS 211.285 to rename the "malt beverage education fund" as the "alcohol wellness and responsibility education fund"; add proceeds from Alcoholic Beverage Control Board distilled spirit auctions to the fund; issue moneys from the fund to the Alcohol Wellness and Responsibility Education Corporation; require the corporation's board of directors to include as voting members all duly elected statewide constitutional officers, the secretary of the Public Protection Cabinet, the ABC commissioner, and representatives of the malt beverage and distilled spirits industries; add the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House as nonvoting members; authorize the corporation to accept grant applications from Kentucky high schools, colleges and universities, and other entities that promote alcohol responsibility; increase Project Graduation grants to $1,000 annually.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 390 (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3010 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 190 (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 189 (Y: 18 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04Housesigned by Governor
2024-03-28Housedelivered to Governor
2024-03-28Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2024-03-27Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2024-03-27Housepassed 62-23
2024-03-27HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2024-03-25Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2024-03-21Houseto Rules (H)
2024-03-21Housereceived in House
2024-03-15Senate3rd reading, passed 31-5 with Committee Substitute (1)
2024-03-15Senatefloor amendment adopted Committee Substitute (1)
2024-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024
2024-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2024-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2024-03-08Senateto Licensing & Occupations (S)
2024-03-04Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2024-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2024-03-01Housepassed 67-24 with Committee Substitute (2), Floor Amendment (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
2024-03-01Housefloor amendment defeated Floor Amendment (1)
2024-03-01House3rd reading
2024-02-29Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute (2)
2024-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2024
2024-02-22Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute (2)
2024-02-21Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
2024-02-13Houserecommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
2024-02-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2024-02-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2024-02-05Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
2024-01-31Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2024-01-31Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hb439.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hb439/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hb439/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB439/HCS1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/24RS/hb439/HCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/24RS/hb439/HCS1LM.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB439/HCS2.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/24RS/hb439/HCS2CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/24RS/hb439/HCS2LM.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB439/HCA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB439/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB439/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/HB439/SCS1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/24RS/hb439/CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/24RS/hb439/LM.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hb439/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback