KY HB437 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 67.0802 to clarify that any proceeds from property disposed of by a county that was acquired through forfeiture or purchased using restricted funds under KRS 218A.420(4)(a) shall be transferred to a restricted account under KRS 218A.420.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the sale or disposition of certain county property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 264 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-29Senate2nd reading
2018-03-29Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-27Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-27Senate1st reading
2018-03-27Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-13Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-09House3rd reading, passed 84-0
2018-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018
2018-03-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-01Houseposted in committee
2018-02-26Houseto Local Government (H)
2018-02-22Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback