KY HB437 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 116.113 to specify that notification of a voter's conviction of a federal felony offense be received from the United States Attorney in accordance with federal law; amend KRS 117.075 to specify that only those voters that have been declared mentally disabled by a court and had their right to vote removed are prevented from voting and to specify that absentee ballot application requests can be emailed; amend KRS 117.085 to allow application for absentee ballot by email and parties other than voter, and to specify rules as to parties with power of attorney over voter; amend KRS 117.087 to clarify procedures as to absentee ballots and absentee vote totals; amend KRS 117.165 conform; amend KRS 117.187 to establish procedures for make-up training for precinct election officers; amend KRS 117.235 to move definition of "electioneering" and create definition of "exit polling" and to establish guidelines; amend KRS 117.236 to remove the challenger exception from section prohibiting checkoff lists or recording of voter identities and add electronic recording device to list of devices prohibited from use; amend KRS 117.275 to clarify procedures applicable to closing down voting equipment and posting return sheets, to establish procedures for designating witnesses to vote count, and to limit inspection of voting records until sixty (60) days after election day except in case of a contest or recount action; amend KRS 117.315 to require written and signed designation of challengers by chair of political party executive committee or governing authority of party for the county, and to establish requirements for challengers; amend KRS 117.355 to conform; amend KRS 117.375 to delete vote punch device from definitions; amend KRS 117.389 to delete not more than thirty (30) day testing time limit; amend KRS 117.995 to conform; repeal KRS 117.387 and 117.391; declare EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-18 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-16 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | posting waived | |
2011-02-14 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2011-02-10 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB437.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB437/bill.doc |