KY HB436 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Department for Medicaid Services to submit a state plan amendment application to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services no later than November 1, 2023, to provide medical assistance for inpatient and outpatient services provided by a residential pediatric recovery center.
Title
AN ACT relating to Medicaid coverage for residential pediatric recovery centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-13 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-02-24 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies
Substance Abuse
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies
Substance Abuse