KY HB436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 24)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 24)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 330.070 to change the renewal period from annual to biennial; amend KRS 330.110 establish the conditions upon which the board can issue an emergency suspension of a license; amend KRS 330.120 to authorize the board to issue subpoenas to compel the attendance of witnesses and the production of books, papers, documents, or other evidence pursuant to investigations; amend KRS 330.210 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to auctioneer licensure.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meade [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2164 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 24) |
2022-03-21 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-18 | House | received in House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-24 | House | reassigned to State Government (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | introduced in House |