KY HB435 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to permit a physician to provide long-term antibiotic therapy for a therapeutic purpose for a patient diagnosed with Lyme disease and not be subject to punishment by the State Board of Medical Licensure; require written information on laboratory testing for Lyme disease to be provided when a test is ordered; exempt physicians from civil liability for providing information; create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require health benefit plan coverage of long-term antibiotic therapy for covered persons with Lyme disease under certain circumstances; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to treatment for Lyme disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-10Houseposted in committee
2020-02-20Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-02-18Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback