KY HB431 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - floor amendment (4) and (5-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - floor amendment (4) and (5-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Require the 2017-2018 Joint Funding Administration allocation be disbursed to the Area Development Districts in the same manner and in the same amount as the allocation and disbursement for the fiscal years 2014-2015 and 2015-2016, except that the amounts shall be reduced by the 9% budget reduction for the fiscal year 2017-2018; establish the Joint Funding Administration Task Force; establish the membership of the task force; require monthly meetings during the 2017 Interim of the General Assembly; require a report of the task force to be submitted on or before December 1, 2017.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Joint Funding Administration Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Duplessis [R] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Adam Koenig [R] |
Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | floor amendment (4) and (5-title) filed |
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | floor amendment (1), (2-title) and (3) filed |
2017-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-23 | House | reassigned to Local Government (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | introduced in House |