KY HB43 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 062)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 062)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 238.545 to remove some of the restrictions on the frequency with which charity fundraising events may be held at unlicensed facilities.
Title
AN ACT relating to charitable gaming.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1030 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 22 (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 22 (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 062) |
2019-03-25 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-6 |
2019-02-08 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 11, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-01-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-09-07 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |