KY HB43 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.470, relating to aging caregivers, to provide for special needs trust assistance for eligible beneficiaries, either as a state trust with individual accounts and pooled investment or a separately established account for an individual beneficiary.
Title
AN ACT relating to state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2013-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 13, 2012 |
2013-02-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-08 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB43.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB43/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB43/vote_history.pdf |