KY HB43 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 189 to define "personal communication device"; prohibit text messaging while operating a motor vehicle; provide for specific exclusions; amend KRS 189.990 to set penalties; provide for a probationary period ending January 1, 2011, during which courtesy warnings will be issued; set fine for violation at $20 to $100 for each offense after the probationary period; exclude court costs.
Title
AN ACT relating to personal communication devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-02-05 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-04 | 3rd reading, passed 80-16 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) | |
2010-02-03 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-02 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 3, 2010 | |
2010-01-27 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-27 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-26 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-22 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Transportation (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Transportation |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB43.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB43/bill.doc |