KY HB427 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.162, regarding special license plates, to reiterate that the county clerk's fee charged is the standard clerk's fee for vehicle registration; establish extra fees for the firefighters special license plate to benefit the Kentucky Volunteer Firefighters Association; establish extra fee for the Masonic special license plate to benefit the Masonic Homes of Kentucky; set fees for special license plates established under KRS 186.164; eliminate the requirement for a special license plate for motorcycle to have 300 signatures; amend KRS 186.040 to conform; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to special license plates and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 152 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-18 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | introduced in House |