KY HB423 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 222 to define terms; require the Office of Drug Control Policy to establish the Family in Recovery Empowerment Public and Private Partnership Grant Program; set criteria for awarding grants; require the office to develop a plan to expend trust funds; require a report from the officel; require the office to establish the grant program; establish the Family in Recovery Empowerment Public and Private Partnership Grant Program trust fund; require the office to assist in establishing four model programs through the grant program during the 2018-2020 fiscal biennium in regions most affected by substance use disorders; provide that the grant program shall cease to exist on December 1, 2028, unless otherwise reauthorized by the General Assembly; require any moneys remaining in the trust fund to be deposited in the general fund if the program and advisory council cease to exist; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Family in Recovery Empowerment Public and Private Partnership Grant Program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-23 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | introduced in House |