KY HB423 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.50-868 to extend the new motor vehicle tire fee until June 30, 2018; allow a one-half of one percent administrative fee to be paid to the Kentucky Infrastructure Authority for the administration of projects; notwithstand KRS 11A.211(5) to increase the executive agency lobbyist registration fee to $199; allow the Auditor of Public Accounts to charge for any additional expenses incurred; require each agency of the Executive Branch to pay an amount required for the operation of the Personnel Board; exempt water withdrawal fees imposed by the Kentucky River Authority from state and local taxes and notwithstand KRS 151.710(10) to direct the use of certain fees; allow the Personnel Cabinet to collect a pro rata assessment from all state agencies, in all three branches of government, supported by the personnel system; notwithstand KRS 304.17B-021(4)(d) to require premium taxes collected under KRS Chapter 136 and the retaliatory taxes collected under KRS 304.3-270 to be credited to the General Fund; provide that Section 2 of the Act is effective only for the next fiscal biennium; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to revenue measures and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | vetoed |
2016-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-28 | House | received in House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-2 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2015 |
2016-03-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2016-03-18 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-17 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 63-37 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-03-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-10 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | introduced in House |