KY HB423 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.155 to allow a small farm winery to produce up to 1,000 gallons of brandy per year; mandate the use of 100% Kentucky products in the production of brandy or its fortified wine products; forbid the offer or sale of brandy as a stand-alone product by the small farm winery, with its use limited to fortifying wine products produced by that small farm winery; exclude brandy and fortified wine production from a small farm winery's 50,000 gallon wine production limit; authorize sampling and sale of fortified wine products at a small farm winery or off-premises retail site located in wet territory; limit fortified wine samples to two ounces per patron per day; direct a small farm winery to only fortify its wine products with brandy it manufactured.
Title
AN ACT relating to small farm wineries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 80-9 |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-12 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | introduced in House |