KY HB423 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 75.010 to allow a fire district to cede territory to a city annexing territory that the district serves, if the city has a regular fire department, subject to certain requirements; specify requirements to be met before district may cede territory; amend KRS 75.020 to reflect requirements established in Section 1; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to fire protection districts and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-03-23 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-06 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-05 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2012 | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-29 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-02-27 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-22 | to Local Government (H) | |
2012-02-21 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB423.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB423/bill.doc |