KY HB422 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 86)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 86)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.8805 to add to the definition of "local government" and additional definitions; amend KRS 65.8808 to clarify the violations that may be enforced by a code enforcement board; amend KRS 65.8811 to clarify procedures for when a vacancy is not filled; amend KRS 65.8815 to require regular meetings to be set by ordinance for the code enforcement board and permit special or emergency meetings; create a new section of KRS 65.8801 to 65.8839 allow code enforcement boards to appoint hearing officers when authorized by local ordinance and set duties and authorities; amend KRS 65.8821 to strike language relating to hearing officers to make conforming amendment and allow code enforcement officers to serve subpoenas issued by hearing officers; amend KRS 65.8825 to make conforming amendment for the utilization of hearing officers in the enforcement proceeding process, acknowledge the alternative fine availability, allow lienholders to be notified of citations, and establish notice provisions for the issuance of final orders to cited violators; amend KRS 65.8828 to allow notification of lienholders with an interest in subject properties of hearings and establish protocols for final orders for code enforcement boards for orders issued preliminarily by hearing officers; amend KRS 65.8831 to state statutory citations for orders that may be brought to the District Court, clarify that the District Court hears the appeal de novo, and clarify when no appeal is filed with a District Court within 30 days, that the order of the board is final; amend KRS 65.8835 to direct how liens are placed on property for subjects of citations and set out permitted inclusions on the lien itself; create a new section of KRS 65.8801 to 65.8839 to establish a lien notification system for local governments to use to notify interested individuals of the placement of liens upon properties; amend KRS 65.8838 to include "imminent danger" as a condition when a local government may take immediate corrective action; create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to define various terms and establish various nuisances relating to vehicles and machinery in various states of repair, uninhabited mobile or manufactured homes, rubbish and excessive weeds and grass, to include unsafe structures on properties, as well as set conditions and processes for liens; amend KRS 99.710 to allow the duties assigned a vacant properties commission to be assigned to a local code enforcement board; amend KRS 382.135 to include the full name of the grantor and grantee in with the deed to real property; amend KRS 426.530 to make a conforming amendment for a repeal; create a noncodified section to set construction and effect of certain repealed statutes; repeal KRS 82.700 to 82.725 and 381.770.
Title
AN ACT relating to local code enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 86) |
2016-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | House | received in House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-4 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016 (Consent Orders #1) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-23 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-23 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-18 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-18 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | introduced in House |