KY HB420 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections in Chapter 260 to direct the Department of Agriculture to implement the Food Safety Modernization Act; define terms, establish exemptions for covered produce and covered farms; authorize a department representative to enter a covered farm or farm eligible for inspection; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations; authorize a department representative to issue a stop movement order for covered produce; establish procedure before an appropriate court; establish violations; establish a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to food safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1335 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 175 (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Housesigned by Governor
2020-03-18Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-18Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-18Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-18Housereceived in House
2020-03-17Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2020-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
2020-03-11Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-10Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-03-06Senateto Agriculture (S)
2020-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-04House3rd reading, passed 93-2
2020-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020
2020-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-21Houseposted in committee
2020-02-14Houseto Agriculture (H)
2020-02-12Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback