KY HB418 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.01-410 to require a notice of methamphetamine contamination to be filed by the county attorney with the county clerk who attaches the notice to the deed of the property when properties are declared to be contaminated with chemicals used in methamphetamine manufacturing; require a notice of decontamination to be filed when the property is properly cleaned.
Title
AN ACT relating to methamphetamine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2012-03-16 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd reading, passed 89-2 with floor amendment (1) | |
2012-03-13 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-12 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2012-03-12 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2012 | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-21 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) | |
2012-02-16 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB418.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB418/bill.doc |