KY HB417 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.46-580 to extend the levy of the hazardous waste management assessment until June 30, 2024.
Title
AN ACT relating to the hazardous waste management fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-23 | House | returned to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-23 | House | taken from Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-11 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB417.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB417/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB417/vote_history.pdf |