KY HB415 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 162)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 403 to create calculation methods for use in determining child support obligations when shared parenting is the ordered custody arrangement; amend KRS 205.721 to increase the fee charged by the cabinet to $35 required by federal law; amend KRS 403.211 to provide that the calculations for child support provided in Section 1 are excepted from the presumption of application of the existing guidelines in KRS 403.212; amend KRS 403.212 to update the amounts in the child support guidelines table; amend KRS 403.215 to require notice of wage assignment orders to be sent to employers using the Income Withholding for Support form; amend KRS 405.467 to allow arrearage amounts to be determined administratively in certain instances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to child support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1051 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 210 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 162)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 36-1
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-03-07Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-04House3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-01Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-26Houseposted in committee
2019-02-26Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2019-02-26House1st reading
2019-02-26Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2019-02-20Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-19Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback