KY HB414 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 367.461 to allow automatic calling equipment to place calls, with recorded messages or artificial voices, to publicly available phone numbers of businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the use of automated calling equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1400 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 180 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30Housesigned by Governor
2020-03-19Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Housereceived in House
2020-03-19Senate3rd reading, passed 31-0
2020-03-19Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-17Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-03-10Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-03-06Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-05House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with floor amendment (2)
2020-03-04Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2020-03-03Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020
2020-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-24Houseposted in committee
2020-02-13Houseto Small Business & Information Technology (H)
2020-02-11Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback