KY HB410 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 211 to define terms; establish the Palliative Care and Quality of Life Interdisciplinary Advisory Council within the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; establish the Palliative Care Consumer and Professional Information and Education Program within the cabinet; by January 1, 2019 require all health facilities to establish systems for identifying patients or residents who could benefit from palliative care; allow the cabinet to require action plans and impose fines for those in violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to patient quality of life.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17Houseposted in committee
2016-02-18Houseposted in committee
2016-02-17Houseto Health & Welfare (H)
2016-02-16Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback