KY HB41 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-28 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-28 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-500 to define "acute-care hospital" for health insurance purposes; amend KRS 304.17A-527 to require that an agreement between a managed care plan and an acute-care hospital shall include provisions for a term of not less than 3 years, a 6-month notice to the plan and the executive director of the department of insurance by the acute-care hospital prior to termination or nonrenewal, procedures to ensure continuity of care for covered persons not less than 30 days prior to termination, no less than 20 days notice prior to termination by the managed care plan to the covered person of the procedures to follow for continuity of care including an expedited internal appeal process and an expedited external appeal if necessary, and a provision requiring mediation or binding arbitration between the managed care plan and the acute-care hospital for any dispute regarding a covered person's access to continuity of care in the event of termination or nonrenewal of the provider agreement; amend KRS 304.17B-001 to confirm.
Title
AN ACT relating to continuity of health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] |
Rep. Ronald Weston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-28 | to Banking & Insurance (S) | |
2010-01-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-25 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | |
2010-01-21 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-21 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 27, 2010 | |
2010-01-21 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-20 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-20 | posting waived | |
2010-01-05 | to Banking & Insurance (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Health and Welfare |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB41.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB41/bill.doc |