KY HB405 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for the payment of claims against the Commonwealth; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to appropriations and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Fleming [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 400 (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 399 (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 375 (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Consider Motion RCS# 374 (Y: 23 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1792 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1767 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 119 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 399 (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 375 (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Consider Motion RCS# 374 (Y: 23 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1792 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1767 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 119 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 176) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | vetoes not acted upon in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 71-23 |
2021-03-29 | House | vetoes overridden |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in House |
2021-03-26 | Senate | line items vetoed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 73-23 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 26-5 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-6 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2021-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-09 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | introduced in House |