KY HB401 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 161.220 to 161.716 to permit the Teachers' Retirement System (TRS) to use and accept electronic signatures as deemed appropriate; amend KRS 161.290 to require all public employers to grant paid leave to teacher trustees serving on the TRS board; amend KRS 161.310 to specify the types of remuneration included in retirement incentives and that costs billed to employers for retirement incentives shall not be an obligation of the state; provide that retirement incentives shall not increase final average salary or annual compensation; amend KRS 161.340 to add insurance to the items for which TRS may contract and delete requirement for the procurement of fiduciary bonds for board trustees and executive secretary and add that the board may expend funds as necessary for indemnification and self-insurance; amend KRS 161.470 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 161.480 to automatically designate a TRS member's spouse as beneficiary for an active member's account balance upon employment until changed by the member; declare the member's spouse as beneficiary of the active member's account balance in the event all named beneficiaries predecease the active member or the member fails to designate a beneficiary; amend KRS 161.500 to specifically address service credit for contracts exceeding 185 days; amend KRS 161.515 to reference new retirement factors for out-of-state service purchases; amend KRS 161.540 to specify eligibility requirements for including annual leave credit in the retirement calculation for calendar-year contracts; amend KRS 161.545 to provide that full-time sabbatical leave by university staff participating in the TRS shall be deemed full-time employment for retirement purposes; require employee and employer contributions to be paid during the period of sabbatical leave; amend KRS 161.553 to adjust the cost schedules of providing statutory benefit improvements for annuitants; amend KRS 161.560 to adjust the methods by which participating employers shall file contribution data and set penalties for noncompliance that TRS may impose; amend KRS 161.597 to require a refund of prior installment payments and a reduction in service credit for a member in default on installment payments; amend KRS 161.614 to include mediation awards to a method that may be binding for the adjustment of a member’s account; amend KRS 161.620 to make technical amendments; amend KRS 161.630 to make technical changes; amend KRS 161.643 to authorize TRS to require more frequent submission of annual reports on reemployed employees by participating employers; amend KRS 161.650 to automatically designate a TRS member's spouse as beneficiary for a retired member's remaining account balance at the time of death unless changed by the member; declare the member's spouse as beneficiary of the retired member's remaining account balance in the event all named beneficiaries predecease the retired member or the member fails to name a beneficiary for the account balance; amend KRS 161.655 to automatically designate a TRS member's spouse as beneficiary for the life insurance benefit available to active and retired members unless changed by the member; declare the member's spouse as beneficiary of the life insurance benefit available to active and retired members if, upon the death of the member, all named beneficiaries predecease the member or the member fails to name a beneficiary; and amend KRS 161.680 to provide detail describing the system's authority to collect overpayments.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Teachers' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 258 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions
Teachers
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Public Officers and Employees
Retirement and Pensions
Teachers