KY HB400 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-20 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-20 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.295 to permit Murray State University to offer doctor's degrees required for professional practice and licensure in veterinary medicine.
Title
AN ACT relating to veterinary medicine programs at comprehensive universities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 110 (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-6 |
2024-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 15, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-02 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-29 | House | introduced in House |