KY HB400 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 154.25-010 to expand eligibility for jobs retention projects; amend KRS 154.25-030 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 154.25-050 to allow for additional supplemental projects.
Title
AN ACT relating to economic development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 23) | |
2012-03-23 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-23 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-23 | received in House | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2012-03-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2012 | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-20 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-24 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2012 | |
2012-02-22 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-21 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-16 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-15 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-14 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB400.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB400/bill.doc |