KY HB398 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 230 to establish the Kentucky Equine Health and Welfare Board; define "board" and "equine"; attach the board to the Environmental and Public Protection Cabinet; specify board membership and terms of service; set out duties and functions of the board; require annual reporting; establish the equine health and welfare fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to equines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-12 signed by Governor (Acts ch. 106)
2010-04-01 delivered to Governor
2010-04-01 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2010-04-01 passed 95-5
2010-04-01 House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2010-04-01 posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) for Thursday, April 1, 2010
2010-04-01 taken from committee
2010-03-26 to Rules (H)
2010-03-26 received in House
2010-03-26 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2010-03-26 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 26, 2010
2010-03-25 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2010-03-23 returned to Agriculture (S)
2010-03-23 2nd reading
2010-03-23 taken from committee
2010-03-17 returned to Agriculture (S)
2010-03-17 1st reading
2010-03-17 taken from committee
2010-03-01 to Agriculture (S)
2010-02-26 received in Senate
2010-02-25 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2)
2010-02-24 floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2010-02-23 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2010-02-18 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 19, 2010
2010-02-18 2nd reading, to Rules
2010-02-17 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2010-02-16 posting waived
2010-02-10 to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2010-02-08 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback