KY HB394 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 336.236 to change the financial statement requirements for a professional employer organization's initial and renewal registration; provide that initial registration shall be valid for one fiscal year for any professional employer organization that completed its initial prior to July 15, 2024; amend KRS 336.238 to include professional employer organization groups; amend KRS 336.240 to include annual renewal registrations in the financial statement requirements; amend KRS 336.248 to require a professional employer organization to submit required wage reports and pay all contributions to the Office of Unemployment Insurance; provide a process for submission of the reports and contributions.
Title
AN ACT relating to professional employer organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2694 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 165 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 165 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 88) |
2023-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | House | received in House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37 -0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 16, 2023 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2023-03-15 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2023-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | to Rules (H) |
2023-03-03 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Small Business
Unemployment Compensation
Workers' Compensation
Workforce
Personnel and Employment
Small Business
Unemployment Compensation
Workers' Compensation
Workforce