KY HB394 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 97.010 to require certain local government playground projects to include wheelchair access ramps, wheelchair-friendly surfaces and at least one (1) wheelchair swing, except where the contract for a playground project was signed prior to the effective date of this Act and for playground projects wholly using private funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to playgrounds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-05Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-13Houseposted in committee
2020-02-10Houseto Local Government (H)
2020-02-06Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback