KY HB393 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 227.715 to expand the sales of fireworks for seasonal retailers to a full 30 days surrounding both the July 4th and New Year's holidays; amend KRS 227.752 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-2 |
2016-03-07 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 7, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-16 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB393.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB393/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB393/vote_history.pdf |