KY HB393 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to create the Kentucky Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act, to define terms; set out factual findings by the General Assembly; require a determination of fetal age prior to performing an abortion; prohibit an abortion after 20 weeks of fetal development except in cases of emergency, allow for civil and injunctive relief; establish privacy protections; allow for severability of the various provisions; amend KRS 311.990 to establish a criminal penalty for violations; amend KRS 213.101 to expand the statistical reporting system for abortions; repeal KRS 311.780.
Title
AN ACT establishing the Pain Capable Unborn Child Protection Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Fischer [R] | Rep. Mike Harmon [R] | Rep. Jim Duplessis [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | discharge petition filed |
2015-03-04 | House | discharge petition filed |
2015-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |