KY HB392 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-03 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 100.324 to require zoning compliance for non-baseload generation facilities under 10 megawatts.
Title
AN ACT relating to zoning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-16 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB392.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB392/bill.pdf |