KY HB390 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 153.215 to abolish, reestablish, and reorganize the Kentucky Arts Council; change the number of members on the council; redistribute membership among different interests; confirm Executive Order 2016-824.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 132) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | Bill passed 68-25 |
2017-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute as a consent bill |
2017-03-08 | Senate | recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 67-22 |
2017-02-27 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-16 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | introduced in House |