KY HB388 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 117.035 to adjust the time of appointment for members of county boards of elections; amend KRS 117.045 to provide the method of appointment of precinct election officers and designate who may qualify to serve as a precinct election officer; amend KRS 117.066 to provide procedures for voting at a location containing more than one precinct and for the consolidation of precinct election officers; amend KRS 117.087 to provide for the verification of submitted mail-in absentee ballots beginning on the day before the election in preparation for counting the ballots on election day; amend KRS 117.085 and 117.086 to conform; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to elections and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 141 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2020-03-26Senate2nd reading
2020-03-26Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2020-03-19Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2020-03-19Senate1st reading
2020-03-19Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2020-02-27Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-24House3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (2)
2020-02-19Housefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2020-02-19Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-18Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-18Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020
2020-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-11Houseposted in committee
2020-02-07Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2020-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback