KY HB385 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 071)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.315 to add the president of the Kentucky Women's Law Enforcement Network as an ex officio member of the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1028 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 151 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 071)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-01Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-15Houseto State Government (H)
2019-02-14Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback