KY HB383 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.786 to add two career and technical education courses per year to the Dual Credit Scholarship; amend KRS 164.787 to rename the Work Ready Scholarship the Better Kentucky Promise Scholarship; delete the dual credit provisions from the program; revise the definitions of eligible institution and eligible program of study; require enrollment of at least nine hours each semester; grandfather students already participating in the Work Ready Scholarship; cite the Act as the Better Kentucky Promise Scholarship Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to scholarships.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby McCool [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-23 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Fiscal Note
Short Titles and Popular Names
Universities and Colleges
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Fiscal Note
Short Titles and Popular Names
Universities and Colleges