KY HB383 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 325.240 to give the State Board of Accountancy the authority to establish a scholarship program; grant the board immunity from being sued when members act in good faith; amend KRS 325.280 to allow CPAs from other states who did not obtain a license in their home state within five years of passing the CPA exam to get a Kentucky license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to CPA licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 196 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-03-10Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-09House3rd reading, passed 85-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020
2020-02-28Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-21Houseposted in committee
2020-02-07Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback