KY HB380 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.190 to prohibit the abuse of a classified school employee when the employee is functioning in his or her capacity as a board of education employee.
Title
AN ACT relating to school employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D] |
Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-1 |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB380.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB380/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB380/vote_history.pdf |