KY HB378 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 156.160 to establish educational coursework completion alternatives for students who are homeless children or youth; amend KRS 213.141 to establish that homeless individuals under the age of 25 shall not have to pay a fee to get a copy of their birth certificate; amend KRS 214.185 to establish that a qualified mental health professional may provide outpatient mental health counseling to any child age 16 or older upon request of such child without the consent of a parent, parents, or guardian of such child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to youth homelessness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 363 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1004 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 246 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housepassed 91-0
2019-03-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-07Senateto Education (S)
2019-03-07Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-06House3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2019
2019-03-05Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
2019-03-04Housereturned to Education (H)
2019-03-04House2nd reading
2019-03-04Housetaken from Education (H)
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-25Housereturned to Education (H)
2019-02-25House1st reading
2019-02-25Housetaken from Education (H)
2019-02-15Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-14Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback