KY HB377 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 315.010 to permit a collaborative agreement to be made between more than one pharmacist and practitioner if certain agreement provisions are met.
Title
AN ACT relating to medical service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-24 | House | returned to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB377.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB377/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB377/vote_history.pdf |