KY HB373 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 210 to define terms; establish a 9-8-8 mental health crisis hotline; create a 9-8-8 board and establish membership; create a crisis restricted fund; create new sections of KRS Chapter 147 to define terms; establish a 9-8-8 service charge; describe the responsibilities of the Department of Revenue in effecting the 9-8-8 service charge; describe the responsibilities of retailers in effecting the 9-8-8 service charge; amend KRS 65.7627, 139.105, and 139.470 to conform; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2023; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Boards and Commissions
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Mental Health
Public Health
State Agencies
Appropriations
Boards and Commissions
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Mental Health
Public Health
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/hb373.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/hb373/orig_bill.pdf |