KY HB370 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 92)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 92)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.162, regarding special license plates, to reiterate that the county clerk's fee charged is the standard clerk's fee for vehicle registration; establish extra fees for the firefighters special license plate to benefit the Kentucky Volunteer Firefighters Association; establish extra fee for the Masonic special license plate to benefit the Masonic Homes of Kentucky; set fees for special license plates established under KRS 186.164; eliminate the requirement for a special license plate for motorcycle to have 300 signatures; amend KRS 186.040 to conform; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to special license plates and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 314 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1715 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 147 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1715 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 147 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 92) |
2021-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | passed 92-0 |
2021-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | received in House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2021-03-05 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (3) |
2021-02-25 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-24 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | introduced in House |